EP0259824 - Process for the preservation of pressed sugar beet pulp at sugar beet processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1992 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lück, Erich, Dr. Robert-Stolz-Strasse 102 D-6232 Bad Soden am Taunus / DE | 02 /
Remmert, Karlheinz Krifteler Strasse 3 D-6238 Hofheim am Taunus / DE | [1988/11] | Application number, filing date | 87113083.7 | 08.09.1987 | [1988/11] | Priority number, date | DE19863631137 | 12.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3631137 | [1988/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0259824 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0259824 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0259824 | Date: | 08.01.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23K3/04, A23K3/03 | [1988/11] | CPC: |
A23K30/15 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [1991/30] |
Former [1988/11] | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Konservierung von Pressschnitzeln aus der Zuckerrübenverarbeitung | [1988/11] | English: | Process for the preservation of pressed sugar beet pulp at sugar beet processing | [1988/11] | French: | Procédé de conservation de pulpes de betteraves sucrières provenant de l'usinage de betteraves sucrières | [1988/11] | Examination procedure | 30.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 09.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0062290 ; | [A]EP0154959 ; | [A]GB1440667 | [ ] - ZUCKERINDUSTRIE, Band 108, Nr. 3, 20. März 1983, Seiten 213-217, Berlin, DE; J. BECKHOFF et al.: "Pressschnitzel - eine Alternative zur Schnitzeltrocknung. Einfluss von Temperatur und Zusätzen auf das Silierergebnis"Seite 214, rechte Spalte, Zeile 9 - Tabelle 3; Seite 215, rechte Spalte, Tabellen 5,6; Seite 216, rechte Spalte, Zusammenfassung | [ ] - INTERNATIONAL SUGAR JOURNAL, Band 85, Nr. 1014, Juni 1983, Seite 186, High Wycombe, GB; C. HELLER: "Pressed pulp silage as an alternative to pulp drying" |