EP0295329 - Liquid crystal color display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uchida, Tatsuo 16-13-42, Maruyama 1-chome Tagajo-shi Miyagi-ken / JP | For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states Uchida, Tatsuo 16-13-42, Maruyama 1-chome Tagajo-shi Miyagi-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Stanley Electric Co., Ltd. 2-9-13, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo 153 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uchida, Tatsuo 16-13-42 Maruyama 1-chome Tagajyo-shi Miyagi-ken / JP | 02 /
Aizawa, Masanobu 5-10-16, Kohnan Kohnan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Adlzreiterstrasse 11 83022 Rosenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Flach, Dieter Rolf Paul, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Andrae/Flach/Haug/Kneissl Prinzregentenstrasse 24 D-83022 Rosenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113116.5 | 08.09.1987 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | JP19870149277 | 17.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14927787 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0295329 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0295329 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G02B5/20 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
G02F1/133514 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/51] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Farbanzeigevorrichtung | [1988/51] | English: | Liquid crystal color display device | [1988/51] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage en couleurs à cristaux liquides | [1988/51] | Examination procedure | 30.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 07.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | DE FR GB IT NL | Licencee: | Research Development Corporation of Japan 2-5-2 Nagata-cho,chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Date: | 31.08.1989 | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | DE FR GB IT NL | Licencee: | Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75752 Paris / FR | Date: | 31.08.1989 |
Former [1989/42] | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Research Development Corporation of Japan 2-5-2 Nagata-cho,chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Date: | |||
ID: | 01 01/exclusive | ||
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération F-75752 Paris / FR | ||
Date: | Documents cited: | Search | EP0224040 [ ]; | JPS6088986 [ ]; | EP0154443 [ ] | Examination | JPH0688986 |