EP0260603 - Channel switching system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1994 [1994/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morimoto, Hideaki c/o NEC Corporation 33-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1988/12] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/12] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113252.8 | 10.09.1987 | [1988/12] | Priority number, date | JP19860215291 | 11.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21529186 | [1988/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0260603 | Date: | 23.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0260603 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0260603 | Date: | 01.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/74, H04L1/22 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
H04B1/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/12] | H04B1/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1988/12] | Title | German: | Kanalumschaltungseinrichtung | [1988/12] | English: | Channel switching system | [1988/12] | French: | Système de commutation de canal | [1988/12] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1987 | Examination requested [1988/12] | 23.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 29.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 29.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0180943 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0060751 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]US4234956 (ADDERLEY JOHN A, et al); | [A]EP0137563 (TRT TELECOM RADIO ELECTR [FR]) |