EP0300084 - Improved deodorant and/or perfumed footwear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states del Castillo Sanchez, Angel C/Baleares 1 Parcela E-50014 Zaragoza / ES | For all designated states del Castillo Sanchez, Alfonso C/Baleares 1 Parcela E-50014 Zaragoza / ES | For all designated states Langa Andres, Pedro C/Baleares 1 Parcela E-50014 Zaragoza / ES | [1989/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/12] |
Former [1989/04] | Zinnecker, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, et al Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113650.3 | 17.09.1987 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | ES19870002439 | 21.07.1987 Original published format: ES 8702439 | [1989/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0300084 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0300084 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A43B17/10, A43B7/00 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
A43B1/0045 (EP);
A43B17/10 (EP);
A43B7/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LU, NL [1989/04] | Title | German: | Desodorierendes und/oder parfümiertes Schuhwerk | [1989/04] | English: | Improved deodorant and/or perfumed footwear | [1989/04] | French: | Article chaussant désodorisant et/ou parfumé | [1989/04] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 23.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 03.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/40] | 06.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.02.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.1990 | 01.10.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2266476 ; | [A]FR2083722 |