EP0283554 - Towel dispenser and process for operating it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1992 [1992/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CWS INTERNATIONAL AG Oberneuhofstrasse 5 CH-6340 Baar / CH | [1988/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arabian, Sandro Auring 53 LI-9490 Vaduz / LI | 02 /
Baumann, Manfred Hinterwiesstrasse 6 CH-9444 Diepoldsau / CH | [1991/42] |
Former [1988/39] | 01 /
Arabian, Sandro Auring 53 LI-9490 Vaduz / LI | ||
02 /
Baumann, Mafred Hinterwiesstrasse 6 CH-9444 Diepoldsau / CH | Representative(s) | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 8008 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | EGLI-EUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEYS Horneggstrasse 4 CH-8008 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 87113692.5 | 18.09.1987 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | CH19860003862 | 26.09.1986 Original published format: CH 386286 | [1988/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0283554 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0283554 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/28 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
A47K10/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/39] | Title | German: | Stoffhandtuchspender und Verfahren zum Betrieb desselben | [1988/39] | English: | Towel dispenser and process for operating it | [1988/39] | French: | Distributeur d'essuie-mains et fonctionnement | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/39] | 19.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/41] | Request for further processing for: | 13.06.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 13.06.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.07.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1137003 (STRATTWELL DEVELOPMENTS LTD); | [A]US3563623 (WALTON RICHARD RHODES); | [X]FR2226964 (STEINER CO LAUSANNE SA [CH]); | [A]DE2555978 (SCHUMM ERICH) |