EP0269801 - Positioning of a patient by a controlled computer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH Postfach 11 28, Industriestrasse 15 82101 Germering / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states DORNIER MEDIZINTECHNIK GMBH Postfach 11 28, Industriestrasse 15 D-82101 Germering / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wess, Othmar, Dr. Max-Nadler-Strasse 17 D-8000 München 81 / DE | 02 /
Novak, Pavel, Dr. Schleissheimer Strasse 44 D-8000 München 2 / DE | 03 /
Mechnich, Klaus Hauptstrasse 23 D-8031 Wessling / DE | 04 /
Schultheiss, Reiner Ringstrasse 16b D-8088 Eching / DE | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Landsmann, Ralf Dornier GmbH LHG 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | Landsmann, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Dornier GmbH FNS 003 D-88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87113695.8 | 18.09.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | DE19863638953 | 14.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3638953 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269801 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269801 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/04, A61B17/22 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
A61B17/2255 (EP,US);
A61B6/0487 (EP,US);
A61B6/4028 (EP,US);
A61B6/467 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00199 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/23] | Title | German: | Rechnerkontrollierte Patientenpositionierung | [1988/23] | English: | Positioning of a patient by a controlled computer | [1988/23] | French: | Positionnement de malade par un ordinateur commandé | [1988/23] | Examination procedure | 28.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 07     Fee paid on   26.10.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3122056 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0139941 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [AP]EP0225104 (INDIANAPOLIS CENTER ADV RES [US]); | [A]EP0168559 (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE3220751 (SCHUELLER JOERG DR) |