EP0262532 - Method for the production of aldehydes and/or ketones by the conversion of epoxides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoelderich, Wolfgang, Dr. Mannheimer Strasse 18 D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | 02 /
Goetz, Norbert, Dr. Schoefferstrasse 25 D-6520 Worms 1 / DE | 03 /
Hupfer, Leopold, Dr. Waltershoehe 3 D-6701 Friedelsheim / DE | 04 /
Lermer, Helmut, Dr. D 3,4 D-6800 Mannheim 1 / DE | [1988/14] | Application number, filing date | 87113729.5 | 19.09.1987 | [1988/14] | Priority number, date | DE19863632529 | 25.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3632529 | [1988/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0262532 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0262532 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262532 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/58, C07C49/04, C07C47/228 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
B01J27/16 (EP,US);
B01J27/1804 (EP,US);
B01J27/182 (EP,US);
B01J27/1853 (EP,US);
B01J29/04 (EP,US);
C07C45/58 (EP,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1988/14] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aldehyden und/oder Ketonen durch Umsetzung von Epoxiden | [1988/14] | English: | Method for the production of aldehydes and/or ketones by the conversion of epoxides | [1988/14] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'aldéhydes et/ou de cétones par la conversion d'époxides | [1988/14] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 27.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP91121666.1 / EP0480482 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP62012736 ; | [AP]JP62019549 ; | [AD]JP53031637 ; | [A]US2694090 (MUSGRAVE WILD ANTHONY, et al); | [A]US2660609 (ROBESON MAX O, et al); | [A]US2031200 (KARL BAUR); | [AD]EP0100117 (ANIC SPA [IT]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 103, Nr. 5, 5. August 1985, Zusammenfassung Nr. 36927s, Columbus, Ohio, US, E. RUIZ-HITZKY: 'Epoxide rearrangments on mineral and silica-alumina surfaces' & Journal of Catalysis, Band 92, Nr. 2, Seiten 291 - 295 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 192 (C-249)(2639), 19. Juni 1987, & JP - A - 62 012 736 (DAICEL), 21.01.1987, & JP62012736 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 193 (C-430)(2640), 20. Juni 1987, & JP - A - 62 019 549 (TOYO SODA), 28.01.1987, & JP62019549 A 00000000 | [A] - METHODEN DER ORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, Band VII/2a, 4. Auflage 1973, Seiten 931 - 959, HOUBEN-WEYL, Georg Thieme Verlag Stuttgart | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, Nr. 5, 31. Juli 1978, Zusammenfassung Nr. 42801e, Columbus, Ohio, US, & JP - A - 53 031 637 (OTA SEIYAHU CO), 25.03.1978, & JP53031637 A 00000000 | Examination | JP5331637 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 89, Nr. 5, 31. Juli 1978, Zusammenfassung Nr. 42801e, Columbus, Ohio, USA; & JP-A-53 31637, & JP5331637 A 00000000 |