EP0264008 - Process for the preparation of 5-methyl tetrazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft 53839 Troisdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states Dynamit Nobel Aktiengesellschaft D-53839 Troisdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bison, Günter Kleiststrasse 6 D-5210 Troisdorf 5 / DE | 02 /
Schlupp, Johannes, Dr. Pützweg 9 D-5060 Bergisch-Gladbach / DE | 03 /
Winterscheid, Josef Kahnweg 2 D-5205 St. Augustin 1 / DE | 04 /
Thewalt, Klaus, Dr. Am Tiemen 12 D-5810 Witten / DE | [1988/16] | Application number, filing date | 87114023.2 | 25.09.1987 | [1988/16] | Priority number, date | DE19863634717 | 11.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3634717 | [1988/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264008 | Date: | 20.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264008 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264008 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D257/04 | [1988/16] | CPC: |
C07D257/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 5-Methyltetrazol | [1988/16] | English: | Process for the preparation of 5-methyl tetrazole | [1988/16] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 5-méthyltétranole | [1988/16] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 26.01.1994 | AT | 25.09.1994 | GB | 25.09.1994 | ES | 26.09.1994 | SE | 26.09.1994 | BE | 30.09.1994 | CH | 30.09.1994 | LI | 30.09.1994 | LU | 30.09.1994 | [2004/37] |
Former [2000/04] | GR | 26.01.1994 | |
AT | 25.09.1994 | ||
GB | 25.09.1994 | ||
SE | 26.09.1994 | ||
BE | 30.09.1994 | ||
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [1996/14] | AT | 25.09.1994 | |
GB | 25.09.1994 | ||
SE | 26.09.1994 | ||
BE | 30.09.1994 | ||
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [1996/03] | GB | 25.09.1994 | |
SE | 26.09.1994 | ||
BE | 30.09.1994 | ||
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/44] | GB | 25.09.1994 | |
BE | 30.09.1994 | ||
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/42] | BE | 30.09.1994 | |
CH | 30.09.1994 | ||
LI | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 30.09.1994 | |
LI | 30.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4097479 (LEIPZIG THEODORE J); | [A]FR2517676 (DELALANDE SA [FR]) |