EP0266541 - Explosion-proof arrangement for a non-aqueous electrochemical cell, and method for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Maxell Ltd. No 1-1-88, Ushitora Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1988/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urushiwara, Hisashi 6-1-6-307, Togashira Toride-shi Ibaragi-ken / JP | 02 /
Iwamaru, Tugiyasu 8-11-207, Showaen Settsu-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 03 /
Kazehara, Kenya 554-3, Shioya Ako-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 04 /
Watanabe, Osamu 2-22-36, Miyayama-cho Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 05 /
Sawada, Kenichi 2-3-14, Daido Tennoji-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 06 /
Sato, Kiyoshi 3-2-5-602, Shirakawa Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 07 /
Yoshikawa, Hirokazu 3-2-5-212, Shirakawa Ibaraki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 08 /
Ikenari, Shigeru 1-4, Aobaokaminami Suita-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 09 /
Yokoyama, Kenichi 2-19-8, Matsugaoka Takatsuki-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler, Alek, et al Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1988/19] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114076.0 | 26.09.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | JP19860228760 | 27.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22876086 | JP19860228761 | 27.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22876186 | JP19860228764 | 27.09.1986 Original published format: JP 22876486 | JP19870123142 | 19.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12314287 | JP19870123143 | 19.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12314387 | JP19870123144 | 19.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12314487 | JP19870123145 | 19.05.1987 Original published format: JP 12314587 | JP19870130246 | 27.05.1987 Original published format: JP 13024687 | JP19870180770 | 20.07.1987 Original published format: JP 18077087 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266541 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266541 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/12, H01M2/22 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
H01M50/3425 (EP,US);
H01M50/528 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/19] | Title | German: | Explosionsgeschützte Anordnung für eine nichtwässerige elektrochemische Zelle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1988/19] | English: | Explosion-proof arrangement for a non-aqueous electrochemical cell, and method for the production thereof | [1988/19] | French: | Dispositif résistant aux explosions pour une cellule électrochimique non aqueuse et méthode pour sa fabrication | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 01.11.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 03.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5979965 ; | [Y]JPS57118363 ; | [Y]JPS59154743 ; | [Y]US3826412 (KNEUSEL R); | [Y]EP0140021 (VARTA BATTERIE [DE]); | [X]CH574350 (ALUMINIUMWERKE AG RORSCHACH); | [X]US4579495 (DASSLER KARL O [US], et al); | [A]FR2079293 (RASSELSTEIN AG); | [A]US4256812 (TAMURA KAZUHIRO, et al); | [A]US4053691 (CILIBERTI JR FRANK L); | [A]US3615867 (CICH EVERETT R, et al) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840831), vol. 008, no. 190, Database accession no. (E - 263)<1627>, & JP59079965 A 19840509 (NIHON DENCHI K.K.) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821028), vol. 006, no. 215, Database accession no. (E - 138)<1093>, & JP57118363 A 19820723 (FURUKAWA DENCHI K.K.) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850110), vol. 009, no. 004, Database accession no. (E - 288)<1727>, & JP59154743 A 19840903 (HITACHI MAXELL K.K.) |