EP0263524 - Stabilizer compositions for plastics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states BASF Aktiengesellschaft Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bock, Gustav, Dr. Waldstrasse 16 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | 02 /
Trauth, Hubert Milanstrasse 5 D-6724 Dudenhofen / DE | 03 /
Weber, Wilhelm, Dr. Mandelbergstrasse 40 D-6730 Neustadt / DE | 04 /
Lechtken, Peter, Dr. Ludwigshafener Strasse 6 b D-6710 Frankenthal / DE | [1988/15] | Application number, filing date | 87114743.5 | 09.10.1987 | [1988/15] | Priority number, date | DE19863634531 | 10.10.1986 Original published format: DE 3634531 | [1988/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0263524 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0263524 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263524 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, // (C08K5/00, 5:15, 5:52, 5:53) | [1988/15] | CPC: |
C08K5/524 (EP,US);
C08K5/1545 (EP,US);
C08K5/378 (EP,US);
C08K5/5393 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/15] | Title | German: | Stabilisatorgemische für Kunststoffe | [1988/15] | English: | Stabilizer compositions for plastics | [1988/15] | French: | Compositions de stabilisants pour des matières plastiques | [1988/15] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 03.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP79055043 | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 91, Nr. 18, 29. Oktober 1979, Seite 30, Zusammenfassung Nr. 141658m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-79 055 043 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD) 01-05-1979, & JP79055043 A 00000000 |