EP0264760 - Preparation of epoxy resins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | [1998/02] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Abbott Road P.O. Box 1967 Midland Michigan 48640-1967 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pham, Ha Quoc 410 North Yaupon Richwood Texas 77531 / US | 02 /
Gammill, Benny B. 3501 Country Road No. 36 Angleton Texas 77515 / US | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114866.4 | 12.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | US19860918739 | 14.10.1986 Original published format: US 918739 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264760 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264760 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G59/00 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
C08G59/00 (EP);
C08G59/04 (KR);
C08G63/60 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Epoxydharzen | [1988/17] | English: | Preparation of epoxy resins | [1988/17] | French: | Préparation de résines époxydes | [1988/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 12.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/36] | 28.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU245368 ; | [A]US4485221 (KRUEGER ULF A [US], et al); | [A]EP0185622 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [A]EP0103282 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [A]DE1961888 (REICHHOLD ALBERT CHEMIE AG); | [A]DE1518122 (REICHHOLD ALBERT CHEMIE AG); | [A]EP0184431 (CELANESE CORP [US]) | [XP] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, no. 276, April 1987, page 221, no. 27654, New York, NY., US; "Preparation of low halide content expoxy resins" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, no. 4, 26th January 1970, page 36, no. 13458s, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU-A-245 368 (S.M.ROZENTULER) 07-06-1969, & SU245368 A 00000000 |