EP0264798 - Split ring springs for snap fasteners and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states YOSHIDA KOGYO K.K. No. 1 Kanda Izumi-cho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Akira 1-5, Horitaka Kurobe-shi Toyama-Ken / JP | 02 /
Hasegawa, Kenji 476-3, Eguchi Uozu-Shi Toyama-Ken / JP | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87114984.5 | 14.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | JP19860249294 | 20.10.1986 Original published format: JP 24929486 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0264798 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0264798 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264798 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A44B17/00 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
A44B17/0011 (EP,US);
B21F45/20 (KR);
A44B17/00 (KR);
B21F37/02 (KR);
Y10T24/3655 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44641 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/17] | Title | German: | Geöffnete Ringfeder für Druckknöpfe und Verfahren für ihre Herstellung | [1988/17] | English: | Split ring springs for snap fasteners and method of manufacturing the same | [1988/17] | French: | Ressorts à anneau fendu pour boutons-pression et leur procédé de fabrication | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1936611 (YOUNG JOHN M); | [X]US1973436 (HJORT JOHN F); | [A]US2328016 (HUELSTER OTTO J); | [A]US2718044 (MURPHY HOWARD J); | [A]US3580030 (BEAN DENNIS P, et al) |