EP0269822 - Automatic wave soldering machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROVERT LTD. 44 Dufflaw Road Toronto Ontario M6A 2W1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states ELECTROVERT LTD. 44 Dufflaw Road Toronto Ontario M6A 2W1 / CA | ||
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states Electrovert LTD. 44 Dufflaw Road Toronto Ontario M6A 2W1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buszard, John F. P.O.Box 317 MacDonald College St.Anne de Bellevue Quebec H9X 1C0 / CA | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Bardehle, Heinz, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Bardehle, Heinz, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/23] | Bardehle, Heinz, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115361.5 | 27.02.1984 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | US19830470494 | 28.02.1983 Original published format: US 470494 | [1988/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269822 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/34 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
B23K3/0653 (EP,US);
B23K1/085 (EP,US);
B23K2101/42 (EP,US);
H05K2203/163 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/23] | Title | German: | Automatische Lötwellen-Maschine | [1988/23] | English: | Automatic wave soldering machine | [1988/23] | French: | Machine automatique pour souder par ondes | [1988/23] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 28.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/05] | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/05] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84102033.2 / EP0118091 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.1988 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2455629 [ ]; | EP0067939 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | EP0083680 [ ] (ELECTROVERT LTD [CA]); | EP0119272 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | EP0147001 [ ] (HOLLIS AUTOMATION INC [US]); | EP0211563 [ ] (NIPPON DENNETSU KEIKI KK [JP]) | by applicant | US3421888 |