EP0266634 - Apparatus for measuring the temperature of a hot point on an energy-transmitting cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL CABLE 30, rue des Chasses 92111 Clichy Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states ALCATEL CABLE 30, rue des Chasses F-92111 Clichy Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states LES CABLES DE LYON Société anonyme dite: 170 quai de Clichy F-92111 Clichy Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thevenon, Henri 288 rue André Philip F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115419.1 | 21.10.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | FR19860014796 | 24.10.1986 Original published format: FR 8614796 | [1988/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266634 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266634 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/32, G01K11/04 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
H01B7/324 (EP,US);
G01K11/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/19] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Messen der Temperatur eines heissen Punktes auf einem Energietransmissionskabel | [1988/19] | English: | Apparatus for measuring the temperature of a hot point on an energy-transmitting cable | [1988/19] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de la température d'un point chaud sur un câble de transmission d'énergie | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3187080 (HUGH BALL EDMUND); | [AD]US3510762 (LESLIE JOHN ROBERT ALEXANDER) | [A] - ELECTRICAL REVIEW, vol. 199, no. 15, 15 octobre 1976, page 48, IPC Electrical-Electronic Press Ltd., Londres, GB; "New capsule measures transformer hot spots" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER APPARATUS AND SYSTEMS, vol. PAS-80, no. 7, septembre-octobre 1970, pages 1429-1433, New York, US; J. KORTSCHINSKI et al.: "A power-cable temperature monitoring system" |