EP0264941 - Spool for holding optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.1992 [1992/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1988/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myers, Daryl Lester 166 East Pine Forest Drive Lawrenceville Georgia 30245 / US | [1988/17] | Representative(s) | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | Blumbach Weser Bergen Kramer Zwirner Hoffmann Patentanwälte Sonnenberger Strasse 100 D-65193 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 87115496.9 | 22.10.1987 | [1988/17] | Priority number, date | US19860922593 | 24.10.1986 Original published format: US 922593 | [1988/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0264941 | Date: | 27.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0264941 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/14 | [1988/17] | CPC: |
B65H55/00 (EP,US);
B65H75/14 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/4457 (EP,US);
B65H2701/513 (EP,US);
B65H2701/514 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/17] | Title | German: | Spule für optische Glasfasern | [1988/17] | English: | Spool for holding optical fiber | [1988/17] | French: | Bobine, notamment pour fibres optiques de verre | [1988/17] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/52] | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CH535714 [ ]; | US4076185 [ ] (DORPH THOR); | US4291841 [ ] (DALRYMPLE PHILIP W, et al); | US4317548 [ ] (ROTTLEB DIETER); | US4545542 [ ] (FRAZEE JR RALPH E [US], et al) |