EP0315703 - Tape cassette container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Herbert Richter, Metallwaren-Apparatebau GmbH & Co. Postfach 17 13 75117 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/20] | For all designated states Herbert Richter, Metallwaren-Apparatebau GmbH & Co. Postfach 17 13 D-75117 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Herbert Birkenfelder Strasse 1 - 7 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | [1989/20] | Representative(s) | Trappenberg, Hans Trappenberg u. Dimmerling, Wendtstrasse 1, Postfach 21 13 75 W-7500 Karlsruhe 21 / DE | [1989/20] | Application number, filing date | 87115729.3 | 27.10.1987 | [1989/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0315703 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B23/023 | [1989/20] | CPC: |
G11B23/0236 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/20] | Title | German: | Magazin für Tonbandkassetten | [1989/20] | English: | Tape cassette container | [1989/20] | French: | Boîtier pour cassettes à bande | [1989/20] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 02.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 30.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 12.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0249997 (RAASCH HANS); | [A]GB1540795 (CRUCIBLE PTY LTD); | [A]BE894483 (COGEBI); | [A]GB2011354 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES) |