EP0268872 - Stitching head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AM INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED 333 West Wacker Drive Suite 900 Chicago Illinois 60606-1265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states AM INTERNATIONAL INCORPORATED 333 West Wacker Drive Suite 900 Chicago Illinois 60606-1265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlough, James R. R.D. Nr. 2, Box 254A Morrisonville New York 12962 / US | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1988/22] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann, Maspoli + Zimmermann AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 87116033.9 | 31.10.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | US19860935747 | 28.11.1986 Original published format: US 935747 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0268872 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0268872 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268872 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B42B4/00, B27F7/28 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
B27F7/28 (EP,US);
B27F7/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/22] | B42B4/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1988/22] | Title | German: | Heftkopf | [1988/22] | English: | Stitching head | [1988/22] | French: | Tête de brochage | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 28.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 18.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0013165 (XEROX CORP [US]); | [A]US3642187 (BARLAND LAURI C); | [A]US3403832 (PABICH ROBERT W); | [A]US2635234 (REED GEORGE H) |