EP0271702 - Oil container for supplying hydraulic working circuits serving for accumulation and resumption of returned oil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/39] | For all designated states MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Dachauer Strasse 667 Postfach 50 06 20 D-8000 München 50 / DE | ||
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Rudolf Am Speckfeld 15 D-8060 Dachau / DE | [1988/25] | Application number, filing date | 87116360.6 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | DE19863643265 | 18.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643265 | [1988/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271702 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271702 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271702 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F15B1/06 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
F15B1/26 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86212 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86228 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/25] | Title | German: | Ölbehälter zur Ölversorgung von hydraulischen Arbeitskreisen mit Speicherfunktion und zur Wiederaufnahme rückgeleiteten Öles | [1988/25] | English: | Oil container for supplying hydraulic working circuits serving for accumulation and resumption of returned oil | [1988/25] | French: | Réservoir d'huile pour l'alimentation d'un circuit hydraulique de travail avec la fonction d'accumulation et pour la reprise d'huile retournée | [1988/25] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/19] | 17.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]SU1285219 ; | [A]DE2715569 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG); | [A]US4210176 (EMMING JOSEPH L [US]); | [A]DE3513143 (HUEBNER FRANZ) | [AP] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED,Derwent Publications Ltd, Sektion Mechanik,Woche 8736, Zusammenfassung Nr.255554,Q57,16.Sep.1987 &SU-A-1285219(DNEPR HEAVY PRESS),23.Jan.1987, & SU1285219 A 00000000 | [A] - HYDRAULICS AND PNEUMATICS. no. 7, Juli 1980, CLEVELAND US Seiten 90 - 92; P.C.Hyde: "Reservoir for mobile equipment: a design primer " | Examination | - DE-Zeitschrift "Fluid", Oktober 1974,S.52 bis 55 |