EP0268166 - Molten metal and fused salt resistant materials, their production and application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woditsch, Peter, Dr. Deswatinesstrasse 83 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Kannchen, Werner Schumannstrasse 14 D-4100 Duisburg 46 / DE | 03 /
Lange, Horst, Dr. Breslauer Strasse 31 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 04 /
Schwirtlich, Ingo, Dr. Hausweberstrasse 26 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1988/21] | Application number, filing date | 87116400.0 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | DE19863639335 | 18.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3639335 | [1988/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0268166 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0268166 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268166 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/65, B22D41/00, C04B35/58 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
C04B35/591 (EP,US);
C30B35/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/21] | Title | German: | Gegenüber Metall- und Salzschmelzen resistente Werkstoffe, ihre Herstellung und deren Verwendung | [1988/21] | English: | Molten metal and fused salt resistant materials, their production and application | [1988/21] | French: | Matériaux résistants aux métaux et aux sels en fusion, leur fabrication et application | [1988/21] | Examination procedure | 06.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/21] | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2318840 (NORTON CO [US]); | [X]DE1646785 (NORTON CO) |