EP0273145 - Multilayer composite structure for smooth surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.08.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Bang Mo 1505 Wheatly Court Schenectady New York 12309 / US | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/45] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1992/28] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/02] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1988/27] | Catherine, Alain General Electric France Service de Propriété Industrielle 18 Rue Horace Vernet F-92136 Issy-Les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 87116409.1 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/27] | Priority number, date | US19860947152 | 29.12.1986 Original published format: US 947152 | [1988/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0273145 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0273145 | Date: | 20.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273145 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/14, B32B27/00 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B29C70/081 (EP,US);
B29C70/086 (EP,US);
B32B27/365 (US);
B32B38/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B32B2038/0064 (US);
B32B2260/046 (US);
B32B2305/22 (US);
B32B2307/406 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2369/00 (US);
B32B2605/08 (US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31 (EP,US);
Y10T442/126 (EP,US);
Y10T442/143 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/27] | Title | German: | Geschichtetes Verbundbauteil für glatte Oberflächen | [1988/27] | English: | Multilayer composite structure for smooth surfaces | [1988/27] | French: | Structure laminée composite pour surfaces lisses | [1988/27] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 28.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.07.1994
26.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE PCD Polymere Ges.m.b.H. Danubiastrasse 21-25 A-2323 Schwechat-Mannswörth / AT Opponent's representative Kunz, Ekkehard Agrolinz Melamin GmbH Patentabteilung, St. Peter-Strasse 25 4021 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.07.1994
26.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE PCD Polymere Ges.m.b.H. Danubiastrasse 21-25 A-2323 Schwechat-Mannswörth / AT Opponent's representative Kunz, Ekkehard, Dr. Chemie Linz GmbH Abteilung Patente St. Peter-Str. 25 A-4021 Linz / AT | ||
Former [1994/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.07.1994
ADMISSIBLE PCD Polymere Ges.m.b.H. Danubiastrasse 21-25 A-2323 Schwechat-Mannswörth / AT Opponent's representative Kunz, Ekkehard, Dr. Chemie Linz GmbH Abteilung Patente St. Peter-Str. 25 A-4021 Linz / AT | 26.08.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.04.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 15.05.1995 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2147850 (SECR DEFENCE); | [X]EP0088584 (WIGGINS TEAPE GROUP LTD [GB]); | [X]US4379801 (WEAVER JAMES C, et al); | [A]US4044188 (SEGAL LEON); | [A]GB1011744 (BOEING CO) |