EP0266797 - Method of processing silver halide color photographic material and photographic color developing composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishikawa, Takatoshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Fujimoto, Hiroshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Ohki, Nobutaka Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Yagihara, Morio Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/19] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87116446.3 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | JP19860265149 | 07.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26514986 | JP19870024374 | 04.02.1987 Original published format: JP 2437487 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266797 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266797 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266797 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/30 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
G03C7/413 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung von farbphotographischem Silberhalogenidmaterial und photographische farbentwickelnde Zusammensetzung | [1988/19] | English: | Method of processing silver halide color photographic material and photographic color developing composition | [1988/19] | French: | Méthode de traitement d'un matériau photographique couleur à l'halogénure d'argent et composition de développement photographique couleur | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/46] | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 10.02.1993 | [2004/35] |
Former [1994/23] | FR | 02.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5332035 ; | [A]EP0032456 ; | [A]EP0173203 (AGFA GEVAERT AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 65 (E-34), 18th May 1978, page 2265 E 78; & JP-A-53 32 035 (FUJI SHANSHIN FILM K.K.) 25-03-1978, & JP5332035 A 00000000 | by applicant | JPS61186559 | JPS61170756 | JPS61188741 | JP3049669B | JPS5697347 | JPS5639359 | DE2227639 | US3408194 | US3447928 | US3933501 | US4022620 | JPS5510739 | US4401752 | US4326024 | GB1425020 | DE2219917 | DE2261361 | DE2329587 | DE2433812 | US3369879 | US3725067 | US4366237 | GB2125570 | DE3234933 | US3451820 | US4080211 | GB2102173 | US4367282 | US3362961 | US3293034 | JPS422794B | US3491151 | US3655764 | US3467711 | US3455916 | US3287125 | US3287124 | US4363865 | JPS61188742 | JPS61203253 | JPS52102727 | JPS59160141 | JPS59180588 | JPS5675647 | JPS5565956 | JPS3716088B | JPS375987B | JPS387826B | JPH01238069 | JPS459019B | US3813247 | JPS5249829 | JPS5015554 | JPS50137726 | JPH037469B | JPS56156826 | JPS5243429 | US2494903 | US3128182 | US4230796 | US3253919 | JPH01143166 | US2482546 | US2596926 | US3582346 | JP2520167B | US3128183 | JPS4223883B | US3532501 | US3893859 | DE1290812 | JPS5395630 | JPS458506B | JPS5220832 | JPS5332735 | US3706561 | JPS55155354 | JPS61131632 | JPS578542 | EP0204197 | JPS578543 | JPS5814834 | JPS59184343 | JPS60220345 | JPS60238832 | JPS60239784 | JPS60239749 | JPS614054 | JPS6111879 | US2407210 | US2875057 | US3265506 | US2311082 | US2343703 | US2600788 | US2908573 | US3062655 | US3152896 | US3936015 | US4310619 | US4351897 | EP0073636 | EP0119741 | EP0119860 | US2474293 | US4052212 | US4146396 | US4228233 | US4296200 | US2369929 | US2801171 | US2772162 | US2895826 | US3772002 | US3758308 | US4126396 | US4334011 | US4327173 | DE3329729 | JPS59166956 | US3446622 | US4333999 | US4451559 | US4427767 | JPS4911572 | US2322027 | US4199363 | DE2541274 | DE2541230 | - JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY OF MOTION PICTURE AND TELEVISION ENGINEERS, (195505), vol. 64, pages 248 - 253 |