EP0271704 - Thermo-electric cooling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states unitechnica Mobilkälte GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 18 D-71696 Möglingen / DE | [1988/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilchman, Udo, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Heinsestrasse 5b D-8750 Aschaffenburg / DE | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87116447.1 | 06.11.1987 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | DE19863639089 | 14.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3639089 | [1988/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0271704 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0271704 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271704 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F25B21/02, H01L35/30, // B60H1/32 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
B60H1/00478 (EP);
B60N3/104 (EP);
F25B21/02 (EP);
H10N10/13 (EP);
F25D11/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | Thermoelektrische Kühlvorrichtung | [1988/25] | English: | Thermo-electric cooling device | [1988/25] | French: | Dispositif à refroidissement thermoélectrique | [1988/25] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.11.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 18.03.1992 | NL | 18.03.1992 | AT | 06.11.1992 | CH | 30.11.1992 | LI | 30.11.1992 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/19] | NL | 18.03.1992 | |
AT | 06.11.1992 | ||
CH | 30.11.1992 | ||
LI | 30.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/45] | NL | 18.03.1992 | |
CH | 30.11.1992 | ||
LI | 30.11.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | NL | 18.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5847619 ; | [A]DE1079659 (SVENSKA TURBINFAB AB); | [A]US2932953 (JOHN BECKET FREDERICK, et al); | [A]US2947150 (ROEDER JR JOHN); | [A]US3040539 (GAUGLER RICHARD S); | [Y]DE1135016 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [A]FR1355802 (C O G I E CIE IND POUR LA TRAN); | [A]FR1409429 (CSF); | [A]US3212275 (TILLMAN JR EDWARD S); | [A]US3216204 (MILLIGAN NEAL P, et al); | [A]US3240261 (MORALES ERNEST L); | [A]US3324667 (HEINZ MULLER); | [A]US3402561 (MAHONEY JOHN R); | [A]DE1284566 (VER FLUGTECHNISCHE WERKE); | [Y]US3769805 (CORINI L) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 7, Nr. 128 (M-220)[1273], 3. Juni 1983, Seite 149 M 220; & JP-A-58 47 619 (FUJI JUKOGYO K.K.) 19-03-1983, & JP5847619 A 00000000 |