EP0268175 - Release agent composition, blends containing this release agent compositon and process for the preparation of flexible moulded foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/21] | Release agent composition, blends containing this release agent composition, process for the preparation of flexible moulded foams and the moulded foams obtained using this process | ||
[1991/01] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 12.08.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1993 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/21] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haas, Peter, Dr. Zwengenberger Strasse 43 D-5657 Haan 1 / DE | 02 /
Weber, Christian, Dr. Paul-Klee-Strasse 68a D-5090 Leverkusen 1 / DE | [1988/21] | Application number, filing date | 87116499.2 | 09.11.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | DE19863639502 | 20.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3639502 | [1988/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0268175 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0268175 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268175 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0268175 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/09, C08G18/65, B29C33/60 | [1988/21] | CPC: |
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
C08J3/20 (KR);
C08K5/17 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/098, C08L75/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/17, C08L75/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/21] | Title | German: | Trennmittelkomposition, diese Trennmittelkomposition enthaltende Gemische und ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von elastischen Formkörpern | [1991/01] | English: | Release agent composition, blends containing this release agent compositon and process for the preparation of flexible moulded foams | [1991/01] | French: | Composition d'agent de démoulage, mélange contenant cette composition d'agent de démoulage et un procédé pour la préparation de pièces moulées élastiques | [1991/01] |
Former [1988/21] | Trennmittelkomposition, diese Trennmittelkomposition enthaltende Gemische, ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von elastischen Formkörpern und die nach diesem Verfahren erhaltenen Formkörper | ||
Former [1988/21] | Release agent composition, blends containing this release agent composition, process for the preparation of flexible moulded foams and the moulded foams obtained using this process | ||
Former [1988/21] | Composition d'agent de démoulage, mélanges contenant cette composition d'agent de démoulage, un procédé pour la préparation de pièces moulées élastiques et les pièces moulées obtenues en utilisant ce procédé | Examination procedure | 09.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/21] | 29.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.1991
15.10.1991
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.09.1991
15.10.1991
ADMISSIBLE BASF Aktiengesellschaft, Ludwigshafen -Patentabteilung - C6- Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 D-67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 25.11.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.12.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.01.1992 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 03.03.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.01.1993 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.01.1993 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 09.06.1993 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0119471 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]); | [AP]EP0240715 (BASF AG [DE]) |