EP0268930 - Circuit arrangement with a self-protecting power switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.1993 [1993/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hebenstreit, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Am Blütenanger 14 D-8000 München 50 / DE | [1988/22] | Application number, filing date | 87116606.2 | 10.11.1987 | [1988/22] | Priority number, date | DE19863638399 | 11.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3638399 | [1988/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268930 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268930 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/08 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
H03K17/18 (EP,US);
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H03K17/567 (EP,US);
H03K17/691 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung eines sich selbst schützenden Leistungsschalters | [1988/22] | English: | Circuit arrangement with a self-protecting power switch | [1988/22] | French: | Montage avec un commutateur de puissance autoprotégé | [1988/22] | Examination procedure | 27.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 26.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0154062 (IBM [US]); | [Y]EP0046962 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2482800 (THOMSON CSF MAT TEL [FR]) |