EP0272434 - Bone drilling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states List, Heinz-Jürgen Lindenstrasse 56 D-7990 Friedrichshafen 1 / DE | [1988/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Ulrich Ludolfingerstrasse 14 D-8500 Nürnberg 30 / DE | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1989/05] |
Former [1988/26] | Göbel, Matthias, Dipl.-Ing. Pruppacher Hauptstrasse 5-7 D-90602 Pyrbaum / DE | Application number, filing date | 87116685.6 | 12.11.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | DE19863639696 | 20.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3639696 | [1988/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272434 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272434 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/16 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
B23Q5/142 (EP);
A61B17/1624 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/26] | Title | German: | Knochenbohrmaschine | [1988/26] | English: | Bone drilling machine | [1988/26] | French: | Perceuse osseuse | [1988/26] | File destroyed: | 12.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/45] | 15.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2124112 ; | [A]US3734207 ; | [A]FR1457220 ; | [A]US3120845 |