EP0269927 - Computerized tomography apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klingenbeck, Klaus, Dr. Dannberger Weg 8 D-8521 Hessdorf / DE | 02 /
Oppelt, Arnulf, Dr. Schwedenstrasse 25 D-8521 Spardorf / DE | [1988/23] | Application number, filing date | 87116741.7 | 12.11.1987 | [1988/23] | Priority number, date | DE19863640195 | 25.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3640195 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269927 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269927 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/03, H01J35/30 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
A61B6/032 (EP,US);
A61B6/4028 (EP,US);
H01J35/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [1988/23] | Title | German: | Computertomograph | [1988/23] | English: | Computerized tomography apparatus | [1988/23] | French: | Appareil de tomographie assisté par ordinateur | [1988/23] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 27.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.05.1993 | NL | 05.05.1993 | [2015/21] |
Former [1994/24] | NL | 05.05.1993 | |
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | NL | 05.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2811464 (HAIMSON JACOB) |