EP0268282 - Light fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.1993 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THORN LICHT GmbH Möhnestrasse 55 D-59755 Arnsberg / DE | [1988/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grimm, Manfred Muehlenberg 81 D-5760 Arnsberg / DE | [1988/21] | Representative(s) | Fritz, Edmund Lothar, et al Fritz & Brandenburg Patentanwälte Malteserstraße 10a 50859 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Fritz, Edmund Lothar, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Fritz Mühlenberg 74 D-59759 Arnsberg / DE | ||
Former [1993/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1990/37] | Grosse, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Gleiss & Grosse Patentanwaltskanzlei, Maybachstrasse 6A D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1988/21] | König, Oskar, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Phys. Klüpfelstrasse 6 Postfach 10 27 33 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117004.9 | 18.11.1987 | [1988/21] | Priority number, date | DE19863639591 | 20.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3639591 | [1988/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0268282 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0268282 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268282 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F21V17/00, F21V17/02 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
F21V17/164 (EP);
F21V17/107 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/21] | F21V17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/21] | Title | German: | Leuchte | [1988/21] | English: | Light fitting | [1988/21] | French: | Armature lumineuse | [1988/21] | Examination procedure | 18.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 25.03.1990 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | 05.07.1990 | Resumption of proceedings | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE7522285U ; | [A]US2792245 (DASHER NORMAN E, et al); | [A]US2960361 (BOUTELLE ALLEN O); | [A]US3302019 (MARVIN MENZIN); | [A]DE2607129 (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG); | [A]DE2655251 (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG); | [A]DE2655252 (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG); | [A]DE2855031 (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG); | [A]DE2915099 (SIEMENS AG) |