EP0316479 - Manufacturing method for layerlike multicolored molding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Hamada Food Industries, Inc. 86 Wakabayashi-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka-Fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states The Hamada Food Industries, Inc. 86 Wakabayashi-cho 2-chome Yao-shi Osaka-Fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizota, Gohei, c/o The Hamada Food Ind.Inc. 86 Wakabayashi-cho, 2-chome Yoa-Shi, Osaka-Fu / JP | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Olaf, et al RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Ruschke, Olaf, et al Pienzenauerstrasse 2 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117101.3 | 19.11.1987 | [1989/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0316479 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/20, A23P1/02 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
A23G3/2061 (EP);
A23P10/28 (EP);
B30B15/306 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, NL [1989/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von schichtförmigen mehrfarbigen Formstücken | [1989/21] | English: | Manufacturing method for layerlike multicolored molding | [1989/21] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de produits moulés multicolorés en couches | [1989/21] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 25.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/27] | 13.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.12.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB174849 ; | [Y]JPS5844997 ; | [Y]JPS60172917 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 126 (M-219)[1271]31st May 1983; & JP-A-58 44 997 (AKIRA HIRAI) 16-03-1983 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 17 (C-324)[2074]23rd January 1986; & JP-A-60 172 917 (SHISEIDO K.K.) 06-09-1985 |