EP0272483 - Methods and materials for HBeAg production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES One Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, Illinois 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES Abbott Park, Illinois 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersen, Philip R. 235 Gillett Avenue Waukegan Illinois 60085 / US | 02 /
Mushahwar, Isa K. 1923 Arthur Drive Waukegan Illinois 60087 / US | 03 /
Mimms, Larry T. 8 Shoshoni Trail Lake Villa Illinois 60046 / US | 04 /
Staller, Jonathan M. 105 Creekside Trial McHenry Illinois 60050 / US | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87117370.4 | 25.11.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | US19860944645 | 19.12.1986 Original published format: US 944645 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0272483 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, G01N33/576, A61K39/29 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N15/00 (KR);
C07K16/082 (EP);
C12Q1/706 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR);
C12N2730/10122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Mittel für HBeAg-Produktion | [1988/26] | English: | Methods and materials for HBeAg production | [1988/26] | French: | Méthodes et moyens pour la production d'HBeAg | [1988/26] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/09] | 21.01.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0075395 (BIOGEN NV [NL]); | [YD]WO8505637 (BIOGEN NV [NL]); | [E]EP0218474 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) | [XDO] - ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS PRESENTED AT THE 1986 MEETING ON MOLECULAR BIOLOGY OF HEPATITIS B VIRUSES, 28th-31st August 1986, abstract no. 25, Cold Spring Harbour Laboratory, Cold Spring Harbour, New York, US; X.K. MA et al.: "Effect of pre-core and portion of core sequence on the expression of HBcAg and HBeAg in E.coli" | [YD] - THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 130, no. 6, June 1983, pages 2903-2906, The American Association of Immunologists, US; K. TAKAHASHI et al.: "Immunochemical structure of hepatitis B e antigen in the serum" | [Y] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, 1985, abstract no. 4874; SLUSARCZYK et al.: "Association of hepatitis B e antigen with the core of the hepatitis D virus", & LIVER 5(1), 48-53, 1985 | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MEDICAL VIROLOGY, vol. 8, 1981, pages 237-243, Alan R. Liss, Inc.; P. MacKAY et al.: "The conversion of hepatitis B core antigen synthesized in E coli into e antigen" | [A] - J. GEN. VIROL., vol. 42, 1979, pages 513-519, SGM, GB; H. YOSHIZAWA et al.: "Demonstration of hepatitis B e antigen in hepatitis B core particles obtained from the nucleus of hepatocytes infected with hepatitis B virus" |