EP0270951 - Lockable window handle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWI Heinrich Wilke GmbH Postfach 12 60 34442 Arolsen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states HEWI Heinrich Wilke GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-34442 Arolsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedrichs, Bernd Remmeker Ring 55 D-3548 Arolsen / DE | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried Patentanwalt Brüder-Grimm-Platz 4 D-34117 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt Brüder-Grimm-Platz 4 D-34117 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 87117553.5 | 27.11.1987 | [1988/24] | Priority number, date | DE19863642253 | 11.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3642253 | [1988/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0270951 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0270951 | Date: | 02.11.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0270951 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B13/00 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
E05B13/004 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, NL [1988/24] | Title | German: | Abschliessbarer Fenstergriff | [1988/24] | English: | Lockable window handle | [1988/24] | French: | Poignée verrouillable de fenêtre | [1988/24] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2836973 (SCHILLIZZI SALVATORE S); | [Y]US4120183 (WALTERS RUSSELL W); | [A]WO8201733 (GKN STENMAN AB [SE], et al); | [Y]US4370873 (EDMUNDS GREGORY A [US]); | [YD]DE3416151 (JANS FRANZ WERNER) |