EP0274661 - A construction assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.1991 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.01.1992 [1992/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stabilus GmbH Wallersheimer Weg 100 56070 Koblenz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states Stabilus GmbH Wallersheimer Weg 100 D-56070 Koblenz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poertzgen, Gregor Markenbildchenweg 32 D-5400 Koblenz / DE | 02 /
Knopp, Axel Tannenweg 11 D-5411 Eitelborn / DE | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Weickmann, Heinrich, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | Weickmann, Heinrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118072.5 | 07.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | DE19863642699 | 13.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3642699 | [1988/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274661 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274661 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47C3/30, F16B21/16 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
A47C3/30 (EP);
F16B21/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1988/29] | Title | German: | Zusammenbau einer Konstruktion | [1988/29] | English: | A construction assembly | [1988/29] | French: | Montage d'une construction | [1988/29] | Examination procedure | 21.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/47] | 07.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2159402 ; | [Y]GB911832 |