EP0272567 - Wheel hub [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.08.1992 [1992/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hückler, Volker Rossittenstrasse 11 D-7760 Radolfzell 16 / DE | 02 /
Eckhardt, Uli Goethestrasse 1 D-6701 Altrip / DE | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1988/26] | Application number, filing date | 87118449.5 | 12.12.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | DE19863644143 | 23.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3644143 | [1988/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0272567 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272567 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60K17/30 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
B60K17/043 (EP,US);
B60K17/30 (EP,US);
Y10T74/1954 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19679 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/26] | Title | German: | Radkopf | [1988/26] | English: | Wheel hub | [1988/26] | French: | Moyeu de roue | [1988/26] | Examination procedure | 27.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/51] | 09.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1381597 (SCHIFFERLE CHARLES J, et al); | [Y]US1427584 (DENISON JULIAN F); | [X]US2357742 (JEFFREY ROBERT K); | [Y]DE1430050 (HILDEBRANDT WILLI); | [A]DE2154474 ; | [A]FR2136160 (FENDT XAVER ET CO MASCHI); | [A]FR2351322 (ETUDES RECH AVANCEES [FR]); | [AD]DE2930298 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN) | Examination | DE2207589 |