EP0272579 - Refractory shields for curved and straight superheater tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1993 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester Massachusetts 01606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Woodruff, Roger W. 28 Laurel Hill Lane Holden Massachusetts / US | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Zumstein jun., Fritz Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | Zumstein, Fritz, Dr. Dr. F. Zumstein Dipl.-Ing. F. Klingseisen Bräuhausstrasse 4 D-80331 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/26] | Madgwick, Paul Roland Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118516.1 | 14.12.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | US19860944913 | 22.12.1986 Original published format: US 944913 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272579 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272579 | Date: | 21.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272579 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F22G3/00 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
F16L3/1226 (EP);
F22G3/00 (KR);
F22B37/10 (KR);
F22B37/107 (EP);
F27D1/12 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/26] | Title | German: | Feuerfeste Abschirmung für gerade und krumme Überhitzerrohre | [1988/26] | English: | Refractory shields for curved and straight superheater tubes | [1988/26] | French: | Protection réfractaire pour tubes de surchauffeurs courbés et rectilignes | [1988/26] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 03.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4337034 (MORGAN II JOHN W, et al); | [A]US4304267 (CAMPBELL JR FRANK) |