EP0266804 - Preparation of hollow plastic articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUSKY INJECTION MOLDING SYSTEMS LTD. 500 Queen Street South CA-Bolton, Ontario L0P 1A0 / CA | [1988/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schad, Robert D. 500 Queen Street South Bolton Ontario L0P 1AO / CA | 02 /
Rees, Herbert PR '5 Orangeville Ontario L9W 2Z2 / CA | 03 /
Hughes, Gary P.O. Box 52 Nobleton Ontario L0G 1NO / CA | 04 /
Murchie, John R. 2 Ottawa Court Aurora Ontario L4G 2Y7 / CA | [1988/19] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Postfach 12 50 78229 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/19] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat. Dr. Peter Weiss & Partner Postfach 12 50 D-78229 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118635.9 | 05.07.1985 | [1988/19] | Priority number, date | US19840648793 | 07.09.1984 Original published format: US 648793 | US19850733969 | 14.05.1985 Original published format: US 733969 | [1988/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0266804 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0266804 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0266804 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/42, B29C49/64 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
B29C49/6409 (EP,US);
B29C49/28 (EP,US);
B29C49/4205 (EP,US);
B29C2791/006 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3008 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3012 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3016 (EP,US);
B29C2949/302 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3026 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3056 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3064 (EP,US);
B29C35/02 (EP,US);
B29C35/16 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/42077 (EP);
B29C49/42079 (EP);
B29C49/42085 (EP);
B29C49/42103 (EP);
B29C49/42105 (EP,US);
B29C49/6605 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/19] | Title | German: | Herstellung von hohlen Kunststoffartikeln | [1988/19] | English: | Preparation of hollow plastic articles | [1988/19] | French: | Préparation d'articles creux en matière plastique | [1988/19] | Examination procedure | 28.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 21.11.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 01.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85108327.9 / EP0173818 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.12.1987 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.06.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.1991 | BE | 09.10.1991 | FR | 09.10.1991 | SE | 09.10.1991 | [2004/35] |
Former [1992/37] | AT | 09.10.1991 | |
BE | 09.10.1991 | ||
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
FR | 28.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/34] | AT | 09.10.1991 | |
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
FR | 28.02.1992 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 09.10.1991 | |
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/21] | SE | 09.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3283046 (DE WITT EARL G, et al); | [A]US4005245 (EDWARDS BRYANT); | [A]FR2394381 (EMHART IND [US]); | [A]US4313905 (HAFELE ROBERT X); | [A]EP0069007 (SETTEMBRINI ANTOINE DI); | [A]US4405556 (VALYI EMERY I [US]) |