EP0272612 - Apparatus and method for cryopreparing biological tissue for ultrastructural analysis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.1992 [1992/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOARD OF REGENTS, THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM Office of the General Counsel, 201 West 7th Street Austin Texas 78701 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states BOARD OF REGENTS THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SYSTEM Office of General Council, 201 West 7th Street Austin, Texas 78701 / US | ||
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states The Board of Regents of The University of Texas System Office of General Counsel The University of Texas System 201 West Seventh Street Austin Texas 78701 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linner, John G. 29 Greenfield Place The Woodlands Texas 77380 / US | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/26] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118696.1 | 16.12.1987 | [1988/26] | Priority number, date | US19860942172 | 16.12.1986 Original published format: US 942172 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0272612 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0272612 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/28 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
G01N1/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gefrierbereitung von biologischem Gewebe für Ultrastrukturanalyse | [1988/26] | English: | Apparatus and method for cryopreparing biological tissue for ultrastructural analysis | [1988/26] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la cryopréparation de tissu biologique pour une analyse ultra-structurale | [1988/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/44] | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0136014 (UNIV TEXAS [US]); | [X]EP0184417 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) |