EP0274704 - Circuit for detecting non-allowed phase errors in a phase-locked loop [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll 0808 Oslo 8 / NO | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states TANDBERG DATA A/S Kjelsasveien 161 Postboks 9 Korsvoll N-0808 Oslo 8 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solhjell, Erik Konvallveien 30 N-00855 Oslo 8 / NO | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1991/17] |
Former [1990/09] | Fuchs, Franz-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/05] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/29] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 22 13 17 D-8000 München 22 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118764.7 | 17.12.1987 | [1988/29] | Priority number, date | DE19863643966 | 22.12.1986 Original published format: DE 3643966 | [1988/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274704 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/14, H04L7/02 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
G11B20/1403 (EP,US);
H04L7/0337 (EP,US);
H04L7/0083 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/29] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Erkennen von unzulässigen Phasenfehlern in einem Phasenregelkreis | [1988/29] | English: | Circuit for detecting non-allowed phase errors in a phase-locked loop | [1988/29] | French: | Circuit pour détecter des erreurs de phase inadmissibles dans une boucle de verrouillage de phase | [1988/29] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 03.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/46] | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3115057 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0153107 (PRIME COMPUTER INC [US]); | [A]EP0141946 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]); | [A]US4607296 (SMIDTH PETER [US]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 8, Nr. 12, Mai 1966, Seiten 1742-1746, New York, US; W.T. HARNETT: "Error feedback clocking" | [A] - TELECOMMUNICATIONS & RADIO ENGINEERING, Band 31/32, Nr. 8, August 1977, Scripta Publishing Co., Washington, US; A.S. GEORGIYEV: "A synchronization system with digital control in high-speed data transmission" | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 28, Nr. 5, Oktober 1985, Seite 1986-1987, New York, US; "Voter frequency control loop for global common clock" |