EP0276459 - Cathode-ray tube and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsuda, Hidemi c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | 02 /
Itou, Takeo c/o Patent Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87118960.1 | 21.12.1987 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | JP19860306512 | 24.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30651286 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0276459 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276459 | Date: | 07.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/89, H04N5/72 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
H01J29/89 (EP,US);
H01J29/86 (KR);
H01J29/868 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/31] | Title | German: | Kathodenstrahlröhre und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1988/31] | English: | Cathode-ray tube and method for manufacturing the same | [1988/31] | French: | Tube à rayons cathodiques et son procédé de fabrication | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 04.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61118946 ; | [AD]JP61118932 ; | [A]JP59096638 ; | [A]JP60109082 ; | [AD]GB2161320 (RCA CORP); | [A]DE3436618 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]WO8302682 (HEIZ THERESE [CH]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 27, no. 5, October 1984, page 2855, New York, US; S.E. WALLACE et al.: "Anti-static tin oxide film CRT faceplate" | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 306 (E-446)[2362], 17th October 1986; & JP-A-61 118 946 (HITACHI LTD) 06-06-1986, & JP61118946 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 306(E-446)[2362], 17th October 1986; & JP-A-61 118 932 (HITACHI LTD) 06-06-1986, & JP61118932 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 209 (E-268)[1646], 22nd September 1984; & JP-A-59 096 638 (ASAHI GLASS K.K.) 04-06-1984, & JP59096638 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 259 (P-397), page 155 P 397; & JP-A-60 109 082 (YOUBEA RUURON KOGYO K.K.) 14-06-1985, & JP60109082 A 00000000 |