EP0302145 - Method for preparing crystalline cefadroxil monohydrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIFAR S.R.L. Via Borromei, 9 I-20123 Milan / IT | [1989/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marsili, Leonardo Residenza del Cantone 731 Milano 2 I-20090 Segrate / IT | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Giambrocono, Alfonso, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Giambrocono, Alfonso, Dr. Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo 19/B I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 87119079.9 | 22.12.1987 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | US19870080999 | 03.08.1987 Original published format: US 80999 | [1989/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0302145 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0302145 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302145 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07D501/22, A61K31/545 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
C07D501/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von kristallinem Cefadroxilmonohydrat | [1989/06] | English: | Method for preparing crystalline cefadroxil monohydrate | [1989/06] | French: | Méthode de préparation de céfadroxil monohydrate cristallin | [1989/06] | Examination procedure | 01.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2349589 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [AD]FR2365570 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [A]US4160863 (BOUZARD DANIEL, et al) |