EP0274128 - Liquid-crystalline polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1999/13] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | ||
Former [1988/28] | For all designated states IDEMITSU KOSAN COMPANY LIMITED 1-1, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hachiya, Satoshi c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Shunji c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | 03 /
Hashimoto, Kenji c/o Idemitsu Kosan Co., Ltd. 1280 Kamiizumi Sodegaura-machi Kimitsu-gun Chiba-ken / JP | [1988/28] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/28] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87119309.0 | 29.12.1987 | [1988/28] | Priority number, date | JP19860309466 | 29.12.1986 Original published format: JP 30946686 | JP19870288475 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28847587 | JP19870288476 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28847687 | [1988/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0274128 | Date: | 13.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0274128 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274128 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/22, C09K19/00 | [1988/28] | CPC: |
C08G65/22 (EP,US);
C09K19/388 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/28] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallines Polymer | [1998/30] | English: | Liquid-crystalline polymer | [1988/28] | French: | Polymère de cristal liquide | [1988/28] |
Former [1988/28] | Flüssigkristall-Polymer | Examination procedure | 21.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 09.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 30.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 30.06.1992 | Appeal received No. T0858/92 | 02.09.1992 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.10.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.03.1999 | CH | 31.03.1999 | IT | 31.03.1999 | LI | 31.03.1999 | SE | 31.03.1999 | GB | 29.12.1999 | [2007/52] |
Former [2002/23] | BE | 31.03.1999 | |
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
SE | 31.03.1999 | ||
GB | 29.12.1999 | ||
Former [2001/12] | BE | 31.03.1999 | |
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
GB | 29.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | BE | 31.03.1999 | |
CH | 31.03.1999 | ||
LI | 31.03.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 31.03.1999 | |
CH | 05.07.1999 | ||
LI | 05.07.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | BE | 31.03.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]EP0228703 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [A]EP0184482 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [A]EP0007574 |