EP0276492 - Silicone-based stabilizers useful in the preparation of improved polyurethane foams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSi SPECIALTIES, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Route 100C, Silicones Building Tarrytown, NY 10591-6728 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states OSi Specialties, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Silicones Building Tarrytown, NY 10591-6728 / US | ||
Former [1988/31] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Myerly, Richard Crebs Rt. 1 Box 243 Davis West Virginia 26260 / US | 02 /
Jorgenson, Michael Walter 5336 Brentbrook Road Charleston West Virginia 25313 / US | 03 /
Critchfield, Frank Edward 2102 Stratford Road South Charleston West Virginia 25303 / US | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Freiherr von Pechmann, Eckehart, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2009/51] |
Former [1988/31] | Freiherr von Pechmann, Eckehart, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87119396.7 | 30.12.1987 | [1988/31] | Priority number, date | US19860948000 | 31.12.1986 Original published format: US 948000 | US19870107343 | 13.10.1987 Original published format: US 107343 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0276492 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0276492 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276492 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/46, C08J9/00 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
C08G18/4072 (EP,US);
C08G18/61 (EP,US);
C08G18/636 (EP,US);
C08G77/46 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1994/14] |
Former [1988/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Stabilisierungsmittel auf der Basis von Siloxanen und ihre Anwendung für die Herstellung von Polyurethanschäumen | [1988/31] | English: | Silicone-based stabilizers useful in the preparation of improved polyurethane foams | [1988/31] | French: | Agents stabilisants à base de polysiloxanes et leur emploi dans la fabrication de mousses de polyuréthane | [1988/31] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.1994 | BE | 01.06.1994 | CH | 01.06.1994 | GR | 01.06.1994 | LI | 01.06.1994 | SE | 01.09.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1997/17] | AT | 01.06.1994 | |
BE | 01.06.1994 | ||
CH | 01.06.1994 | ||
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 01.06.1994 | |
BE | 01.06.1994 | ||
CH | 01.06.1994 | ||
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 01.06.1994 | |
CH | 01.06.1994 | ||
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/05] | CH | 01.06.1994 | |
LI | 01.06.1994 | ||
SE | 01.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | CH | 01.06.1994 | |
LI | 01.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8504891 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB]); | [A]US4554295 (RIDGE JR CHARLES A [US]) | Examination | JPS5938044 | EP0193815 |