EP0225316 - Method and apparatus for winding wedge-shaped segments for an electrical coil of an electrical transformer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUHLMAN CORPORATION 2565 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | For all designated states KUHLMAN CORPORATION 2565 West Maple Road Troy Michigan 48084 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fisher, John LaVerne 1040 Maywick Drive Lexington Kentucky / US | 02 /
Macemon, Herbert Jennings Route 4 Box 36 Gaybourne Way Versailles Kentucky / US | 03 /
Richerson, James Donald 466 Bold Court Versailles Kentucky / US | 04 /
Wiedo, Richard Wayne Route 3 Duncan Road Frankfort Kentucky / US | 05 /
Curtis, Joe Elmer, Jr. 1461 Pine Meadow Road Lexington, Kentucky / US | 06 /
Rafferty, James Fred 21647 North Park Drive Fairview Park Ohio / US | 07 /
Aishton, Thomas Hoovler 4106 Mayflower Boulevard Whitehall Ohio / US | [1987/24] | Representative(s) | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | Bowman, Paul Alan, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R OAE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87200039.3 | 04.01.1983 | [1987/24] | Priority number, date | US19820337356 | 06.01.1982 Original published format: US 337356 | [1987/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0225316 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01F41/04, H01F41/08 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
H01F41/022 (EP);
H01F27/322 (EP);
H01F30/16 (EP);
H01F41/02 (EP);
H01F41/04 (EP);
H01F41/077 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Wickeln von keilförmigen Segmenten für eine elektrische Spule eines elektrischen Transformators | [1987/24] | English: | Method and apparatus for winding wedge-shaped segments for an electrical coil of an electrical transformer | [1987/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de bobinage de segments cunéiformes pour un enroulement électrique d'un transformateur électrique | [1987/24] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 25.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/37] | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP83300004.5 / EP0083567 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1991 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE221001 ; | [A]GB191119116 (LAKE WILLIAM EDWARD [GB]); | [Y]DE479292 (AEG); | [A]GB989544 (REYROLLE A & CO LTD); | [A]GB1079815 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [A]US3786353 (PUN J); | [Y]FR2309109 (OREGA ELECTRO MECANIQUE [FR]) |