EP0232936 - Anti-corrosion protecive coatings for metal surfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE KENDALL COMPANY One Federal Street Boston, Ma 02101 / US | [1987/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huddleston, Elwyn G. Route 6, Box 514 Franklin Kentucky 42134 / US | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200125.0 | 27.01.1987 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | US19860823222 | 28.01.1986 Original published format: US 823222 | US19860843943 | 25.03.1986 Original published format: US 843943 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0232936 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0232936 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/08, C09J7/02, C09J3/12, F16L58/16 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
F16L58/1063 (EP);
C09D5/08 (EP);
C09J123/22 (EP);
C09J123/283 (EP);
C09J7/383 (EP);
C08L2666/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C09J123/22, C08L2666/02 (EP);
C09J123/283, C08L2666/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | Korrosionsverhindernde Überzugsmittel für Metalloberflächen | [1987/34] | English: | Anti-corrosion protecive coatings for metal surfaces | [1987/34] | French: | Revêtements de protection contre la corrosion pour surfaces métalliques | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 27.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/19] | 06.02.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.01.1992 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58003827 ; | [AD]US4472231 ; | [A]GB592218 ; | [A]US3033724 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no.74, (M-203)[1219], 26th March 1983; & JP-A-58 003 827 (FURUKAWA DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 10-01-1983, & JP58003827 A 00000000 |