EP0237090 - Tactile relief display device and method for manufacturing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.03.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1997 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 14.05.1997 [1997/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.J. TIEMAN B.V. Moolhoek 5 3235 XK Rockanje / NL | [1997/20] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states F.J. TIEMAN B.V. Moolhoek 5 NL-3235 XK Rockanje / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tieman, Frans Jan Molendijk 20 NL-3235 XG Rockanje / NL | 02 /
Zeehuisen, Kees Tiendweerde 2 NL-3237 RB Rockanje / NL | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Bakker, Gilles Egbert, et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau De Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | Bakker, Gilles Egbert, Ir., et al Octrooi- en Merkenbureau De Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1994/27] | Steinmeister, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte TER MEER-MÜLLER-STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 D-33617 Bielefeld / DE | ||
Former [1987/38] | de Wit, Gerard Frederik, Ir. Octrooi- en Merkenbureau de Wit B.V. Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200234.0 | 13.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | NL19860000453 | 24.02.1986 Original published format: NL 8600453 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237090 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0237090 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0237090 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G09B21/00 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
G09B21/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | Taktile Reliefabbildungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1987/38] | English: | Tactile relief display device and method for manufacturing it | [1987/38] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage en relief tactile et son procédé de fabrication | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.1990
31.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE K.G.S., Kabushiki Kaisha 2-25-7 Higashino, Urayashu-shi Chiba-ken 279 / JP Opponent's representative Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.08.1990
31.08.1990
ADMISSIBLE K.G.S., Kabushiki Kaisha 2-25-7 Higashino, Urayashu-shi Chiba-ken 279 / JP Opponent's representative Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | 28.08.1990 | No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 30.08.1990 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 08.10.1990 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.02.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.02.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1991 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.07.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.12.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.02.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4044350 (TRETIAKOFF OLEG, et al); | [AD]US4473356 (FERNANDO LLAVANYA X [US], et al) |