EP0237099 - Wideband distributed amplifier circuit in the ultra-high frequency region [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes 94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | For:DE
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE PHILIPS 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1987/38] | For:FR
LABORATOIRES D'ELECTRONIQUE ET DE PHYSIQUE APPLIQUEE L.E.P. 3, Avenue Descartes F-94450 Limeil-Brévannes / FR | ||
For:DE
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gamand, Patrice Société SPID 209 Rue de L'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Landousy, Christian, et al Philips IP&S France Société Civile SPID 33 rue de Verdun BP 313 92156 Suresnes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Landousy, Christian, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87200294.4 | 23.02.1987 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | FR19860002823 | 28.02.1986 Original published format: FR 8602823 | [1987/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0237099 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/60 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
H03F1/18 (EP,US);
H03F3/607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/38] | Title | German: | Breitbandkettenverstärkerschaltung im Ultrahochfrequenzbereich | [1987/38] | English: | Wideband distributed amplifier circuit in the ultra-high frequency region | [1987/38] | French: | Circuit amplificateur distribué large bande dans le domaine des hyperfréquences | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 13.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/09] | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 15th EUROPEAN MICROWAVE CONFERENCE, 9-13 septembre 1985, Société des Electriciens et des Electroniciens, pages 541-546, Microwave Exhibitions and Publishers Ltd,, Tunbridge Wells, Kent, GB; P. GAMAND: "A 0.1 to 25 GHz HMIC distributed amplifier on AL203 substrate" | [A] - MICROWAVE JOURNAL, vol. 27, no. 4, avril 1984, pages 71-79, Dedham Massachusetts, US; Y. AYASLI: "Decade bandwidth amplification at microwave frequencies" | [A] - 1982 IEEE MIT-S INTERNATIONAL MICROWAVE SYMPOSIUM DIGEST, 15-17 juin 1982, Dannas, Texas, pages 459-461, IEEE, New York, US; A.N. RIDDLE et al.: "Odd order impedance matching networks for low cost microwave integrated circuits" |