EP0241058 - Ink ribbon shift mechanism for a multi-colour ink ribbon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.10.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:FR
GB
IT
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
IT
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adamek, Manfred Fliederweg 36 D-5242 Freusburg / DE | 02 /
Weber, Wendelin Gussweg 4 D-5900 Siegen-Eiserfeld / DE | 03 /
Engler, Peter Braunfelser Strasse 34 D-5900 Siegen / DE | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Koch, Ingo, et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Koch, Ingo, Dr.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Wendenstrasse 35c D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87200378.5 | 03.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | DE19863607937 | 11.03.1986 Original published format: DE 3607937 | [1987/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241058 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B41J35/14 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
B41J35/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/42] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Umschaltung des Farbbereichs eines Mehrfarben-Farbbandes | [1987/42] | English: | Ink ribbon shift mechanism for a multi-colour ink ribbon | [1987/42] | French: | Mécanisme de décalage du ruban encreur pour un ruban multi-couleur | [1987/42] | File destroyed: | 26.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 15.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/48] | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0158963 ; | [A]US4391540 ; | [X]JPS60145877 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 9, Nr. 311 (M-436)[2034]7. Dezember 1985; & JP-A-60 145 877 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 01-08-1985 |