EP0241083 - Method of producing a coating or a self-sustaining body of cerium-oxyfluoride [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION Corporate Headquarters 6100 Glades Road/Suite 305 Boca Raton Florida 33434 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | For all designated states ELTECH SYSTEMS CORPORATION Corporate Headquarters 6100 Glades Road/Suite 305 Boca Raton Florida 33434 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duruz, Jean-Jaques 4, rue de Hesse CH-1204 Geneva / CH | [1987/42] | Representative(s) | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al CRONIN Intellectual Property Chemin de Précossy 31 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/42] | Cronin, Brian Harold John, et al c/o DST SA 9, Route de Troinex CH-1227 Carouge/GE / CH | Application number, filing date | 87200587.1 | 30.03.1987 | [1987/42] | Priority number, date | EP19860810157 | 02.04.1986 Original published format: EP 86810157 | [1987/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241083 | Date: | 14.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C01F17/00, C25B1/00, C25C3/12, G01N27/12 | [1987/42] | CPC: |
C01F17/259 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Überzugs oder eines selbsttragenden Körpers aus Ceriumoxyfluorid | [1987/42] | English: | Method of producing a coating or a self-sustaining body of cerium-oxyfluoride | [1987/42] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un revêtement ou d'un corps autoportant à base d'oxyfluorure de cérium | [1987/42] | File destroyed: | 26.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 14.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/19] | 01.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/16] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1990/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0114085 (ELTECH SYSTEMS CORP [US]); | [A]US3341437 (RUSSELL WOOD LYLE); | [A]GB1149319 (PECHINEY SAINT GOBAIN [FR]); | [A]LU39773 | [AD] - COMPTE RENDU D L'ACADEMIE DES SCIENCES PARIS, part 268, serie C, 17th February 1969, pages 604-607, Paris, FR; J. PANNETIER et al.: "Contribution à l'étude des oxyfluorures de cérium" | [AD] - BULLETIN DE LA SOCIETE CHIMIQUE DE FRANCE, no. 8, 1968, pages 3096-3098; J.-P. BESSE et al.: "Etude des systèmes CeF3-Ce02, CeF3-Ce203 et CeF3-Ce02-Ce203" |