EP0241991 - Field effect transistor having a membrane overlying the gate insulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sentron v.o.f. Oosteinde 8 NL-9301 LJ Roden / NL | [1987/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schreurs, Joannes Peter Gerardus Maria Roderweg 72 NL-9301 RG Roden / NL | 02 /
Talma, Auke Gerardus 't Zuden 18 NL-9351 CV Leek / NL | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200648.1 | 06.04.1987 | [1987/43] | Priority number, date | NL19860000872 | 07.04.1986 Original published format: NL 8600872 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0241991 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
G01N27/414 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/43] | Title | German: | Feldeffekttransistor mit einer Membrane auf dem Torisolierstoff | [1987/43] | English: | Field effect transistor having a membrane overlying the gate insulator | [1987/43] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ ayant une membrane par-dessus l'isolant de porte | [1987/43] | File destroyed: | 08.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 18.01.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |