EP0244006 - General-purpose cleaning composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.1991 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1987/45] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke, David Ellis 48 Keswick Avenue Bromborough Wirral Merseyside / GB | [1987/45] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Susan Margaret, et al UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Thomas, Susan Margaret, et al UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1987/45] | van Gent, Jan Paulus Unilever N.V., Patent Division Postbus 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200671.3 | 09.04.1987 | [1987/45] | Priority number, date | GB19860009806 | 22.04.1986 Original published format: GB 8609806 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0244006 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0244006 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/72, C11D3/37 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
C11D3/3765 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | Allzweck-Reinigerzusammensetzung | [1987/45] | English: | General-purpose cleaning composition | [1987/45] | French: | Composition de nettoyage pour tous usages | [1987/45] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 21.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/42] | Request for further processing for: | 27.09.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0125711 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [Y]DE1273108 (GEN ANILINE & FILM CORP); | [Y]DE2745275 (UNILEVER NV); | [YD]EP0066342 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0017149 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |