EP0247681 - Magnetic material, magnetic recording medium, and method of manufacturing a magnetic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huizing, Albert c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Zegers, Cornelis Petrus G. M. c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Brondijk, Johannes J. c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Pennings, Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Pennings, Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1987/49] | Auwerda, Cornelis Petrus INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 87200932.9 | 19.05.1987 | [1987/49] | Priority number, date | NL19860001372 | 29.05.1986 Original published format: NL 8601372 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247681 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247681 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/706, H01F1/11 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
G11B5/70678 (EP,US);
Y10S428/90 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/49] | Title | German: | Magnetisches Material, magnetischer Aufzeichnungsträger und Methode zur Herstellung eines magnetischen Materials | [1987/49] | English: | Magnetic material, magnetic recording medium, and method of manufacturing a magnetic material | [1987/49] | French: | Matériau magnétique, milieu d'enregistrement magnétique, et méthode de fabrication d'un matériau magnétique | [1987/49] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/30] | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 08.08.1990 | [1991/33] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP5955002 ; | [A]US3047429 (STOLLER ARTHUR I, et al); | [A]FR1553674 ; | [A]GB1142214 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 149 (E-255)[1586], 12th July 1984; & JP-A-59 55 002 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 29-03-1984, & JP5955002 A 00000000 |