EP0248494 - Polymeric stabilizer compounds and process for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 20121 Milano / IT | For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 90139 Palermo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | ||
For all designated states ENICHEM SYNTHESIS S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | |||
Former [1987/50] | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | ||
For all designated states ENICHEM SINTESI S.p.A. Via Ruggero Settimo 55 I-90139 Palermo / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roggero, Arnaldo Via Libèrta 72 I-20097 San Donato Milanese Milan / IT | 02 /
Bertolini, Guglielmo Via Parco Vecchio 30/3 I-27100 Pavia / IT | [1987/50] | Representative(s) | Roggero, Sergio, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | [1987/50] | Application number, filing date | 87201029.3 | 02.06.1987 | [1987/50] | Priority number, date | IT19860020683 | 05.06.1986 Original published format: IT 2068386 | [1987/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0248494 | Date: | 09.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0248494 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248494 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/44, C08C19/02, C08L23/12 | [1987/50] | CPC: |
C08C19/44 (EP,US);
C08C19/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/50] | Title | German: | Polymere Stabilisatoren und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung | [1987/50] | English: | Polymeric stabilizer compounds and process for their preparation | [1987/50] | French: | Stabilisants polymères et procédé pour leur préparation | [1987/50] | Examination procedure | 04.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB943060 (GOODRICH CO B F); | [A]EP0001547 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [A]EP0180853 (NIPPON ZEON CO [JP]); | [AP]EP0218298 (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT]) |